HI HB646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB646
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE/HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE/HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows individuals who are blind or visually handicapped to apply for and obtain a removable windshield placard to use a parking space reserved for persons with disabilities. (HB646 HD1)
Title
Relating To Parking For Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/HMS, JDC. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/HMS, JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/HMS. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 749), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB646 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.