HI HB662 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB662
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of October as "Disability Awareness Month: Employment, Enrichment, and Inclusion" to annually recognize the immense contributions and achievements of persons with disabilities in the State.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 174), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to HLT/HSH, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB662 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Subjects
Disability Awareness Month: Employment, Enrichment, and Inclusion
Persons with Disabilities
Workers with Disabilities
Persons with Disabilities
Workers with Disabilities