HI HB68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB68
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reallocates barrel tax revenues by increasing the distribution amounts to the environmental response revolving fund, energy security special fund, energy systems development special fund, and agricultural development and food security fund, in lieu of a distribution to the general fund.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB68 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=68&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB68_.HTM |