HI HB685 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB685
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that until the department of health establishes the clean and sober homes registry, group living facility operators shall be permitted to operate upon providing notice of operation to the applicable county.
Title
Relating To Group Living Facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB685 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5
SB573 (Same As) 2019-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB573 (Same As) 2019-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=685&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB685_.HTM |