HI HB712 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the parent or legal guardian of a minor child to place a security freeze on the minor child's credit report.
Title
Credit Protection; Security Freeze; Minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=712&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB712_.HTM |