HI HB759 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits electric public utilities to delivering electricity. Prohibits acquisition of electricity by an electric public utility power purchase agreement with an affiliated entity. Requires electric public utilities to purchase lowest cost, nonfossil fuel generated electricity prior to purchasing fossil fuel generated electricity. Requires PUC to establish a statewide electricity rate for utilities held by the same holding company. Exempts utilities qualifying as a cooperation under section 501(c)(12) of the IRC. Prioritizes geothermal as a replacement for fossil fuel.
Title
Electric Public Utilities; Operations; Rates; Energy Sources
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=759&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB759_.HTM |