HI HB760 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a full-service franchise restaurant to disclose its non-participation in national advertising campaigns that offer a promotion or discount with a sign at the entrance or storefront of the restaurant. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 678) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 405).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1330 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback