HI HB77 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes notaries public to perform remote notarizations under certain circumstances. (HB77 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Notarial Acts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 11).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 305) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback