HI HB821 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 108, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 108, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals provisions of Chapters 302A and 302L, Hawaii Revised Statutes, as related to early childhood education, to clarify the respective roles of the Department of Education and the Executive Office on Early Learning. (SD1)
Title
Early Childhood Education; Housekeeping
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 108, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 108, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 679). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 654). |
2015-05-01 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Luke, Kong, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Kong added as Conferee. Representative Say discharged as Conferee. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-22-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Riviere, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Say, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1461) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 937) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Matsumoto. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB843 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30