HI HB827 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and the appropriation of funds for plans, design, and construction of a juvenile services center as part of a mixed-use residential project at 902 Alder Street. (HB827 HD3)
Title
CIP; 902 Alder Street, Honolulu, Oahu ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HSH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HSH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 238). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3). |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |