HI HB858 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 274, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1380).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Hawaii Strategic Development Corporation for the HI Growth Initiative, an investment program to develop an ecosystem to support high-growth entrepreneurial companies in the State. Requires report to Legislature. Appropriation. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB858 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Strategic Development Corporation; HI Growth Initiative ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 274, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1380).
2013-07-09HouseAct 274, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1380).
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 183).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 183) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ige, English, Kouchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, McKelvey, Luke, Cachola, Choy, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 423.
2013-04-19HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:30PM in conference room 423.
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:30PM in conference room 423.
2013-04-17SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 701).
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16HouseHouse conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Choy.
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); English, Kouchi, Wakai.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Tsuji, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Ward.
2013-04-15HouseRe-referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2013-03-22SenateReported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2013-03-20SenateThe committee reconsidered its previous decision on this measure. The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai.
2013-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai.
2013-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 2:50PM in conference room 016.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to EGH, WAM.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 294).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-12HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
2013-02-12HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-02-01HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2013-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-01-24HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1089 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to EGH, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback