HI HB858 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB858
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agency sharing of documents and information containing citizenship and other biographical information collected from a person applying for a limited purpose driver's license, limited purpose provisional driver's license, or limited purpose instruction permit.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Driver Licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB858 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=858&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB858_.HTM |