HI HB892 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the state motor vehicle registration fee by an unspecified amount, to be deposited into the Disability and Communication Access Board Special Fund to cover the costs of administering the parking program for persons with disabilities. Effective January 1, 2030, and repealed January 1, 2019. (HB892 HD2)
Title
Disabled Persons Parking; Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 301). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Fukumoto; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-30-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1123 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.