HI HB903 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a separate Water Pollution Control account and authorizes the Director of Health to prescribe fees to help fund the operations of the Department of Health in managing pollution from nonpoint sources and individual wastewater systems. (SD1)
Title
Nonpoint Source Water Pollution; Fee Rules; Separate Account
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-13 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from ENE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Nishihara. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/HTH deferred the measure until 03-19-13 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 3:10PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to ENE/HTH, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 303). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Woodson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 908) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Cabanilla, Kobayashi, Woodson; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Cheape. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13 at 9:30am. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-22-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-13. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, HLT, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1134 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.