HI HB904 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or distribution of caffeinated beer beverages unless labeled as an intoxicating liquor and accompanied by a warning about the potentially harmful effects of consumption. (SD1)
Title
Beer Beverage; Caffeine; Labeling and Warning
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Solomon. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 192). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Thielen. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Thielen. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-23-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 19 | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, HED, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |