HI HB921 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Act 014, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Act 014, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Affirms the authority of the Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board to issue orders or take other appropriate action to enforce its rules and orders and allows parties to electronically file appeals to the appellate court.
Title
Labor and Industrial Relations Appeals Board Proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Act 014, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2013-04-17 | House | Act 014, on 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114). |
2013-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 444). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Green, Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 51). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-19 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.