HI HB941 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 064, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an employee's designation of beneficiary form to be kept in the department where the employee is employed. Permits the designation of beneficiary information to be filed and maintained electronically. (HB941 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employee's Designation Of Beneficiary Form.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 064, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
2019-06-12HouseAct 064, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 54).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 54) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson Chair; Kitagawa, Matsumoto.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 680) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04SenateOne Day Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1858) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 430).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB , referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1168 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback