HI HB957 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB957
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals county authority to exempt certified or approved housing projects from general excise taxes and requires all rental projects certified or approved under 201H-36, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to undergo annual rent recertifications.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB957 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB957 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=957&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB957_.HTM |