HI HB986 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires third party administrators to be licensed and regulated by the Insurance Commissioner. (HB986 HD1)
Title
Relating To Regulatory Authority Of The Insurance Commissioner.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-06-19. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB986 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB1212 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 072, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
SB1212 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 072, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).