HI HB989 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DLNR to calculate penalties for the unlawful taking of each saltwater or freshwater non-game fish, or any specimen of aquatic life, by multiplying each separate species unlawfully taken by the quantity of that species taken, using the appropriate fine based on the species of the fish or aquatic life.
Title
Aquatic Life; Illegal Taking; Formula for Calculating Fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, Ito, Jordan, Oshiro, Say voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Re-referred to WAL/OMH, referral sheet 29 |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |