HI HCR166 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to TSM.
Pending: Senate Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to TSM.
Pending: Senate Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Tourism Authority, In Collaboration With The Hawaii Boxing Commission And Other Related Parties, To Continue To Pursue Bringing World-class Boxing Events To Hawaii.
Title
HTA; Boxing Commission; Boxing Events in Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to TSM. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 499). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee, Mizuno excused. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Berg, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Takai, Tsuji, Wooley, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-22-10 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-04 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR102 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.