HI HR138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Create A Student-led Working Group To Address The Need For Active Inclusion Of Diverse Identities Within And Beyond Sexual Health Education, To Teach Culturally Responsive Ideas Around Mutual Respect In Relationships, And To Find Sites Of Potential Active Inclusion Of These Identities In Sexual Health Curricula, All Within The Framing Principles Of Aloha Kekahi I Kekahi.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Create A Student-led Working Group To Address The Need For Active Inclusion Of Diverse Identities Within And Beyond Sexual Health Education, To Teach Culturally Responsive Ideas Around Mutual Respect In Relationships, And To Find Sites Of Potential Active Inclusion Of These Identities In Sexual Health Curricula, All Within The Framing Principles Of Aloha Kekahi I Kekahi.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ohno. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR138 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
HR138 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR138 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.