HI HR48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Approve The Request To Reopen Paradise Park As A Hawaiian Cultural Center.
Title
Paradise Park; Hawaiian Cultural Center
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-04 | House | Offered |
2014-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR70 (Same As) 2014-03-12 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=48&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR48_.HTM |