HI HR64 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR64
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT/TRN, CPC, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT/TRN, CPC, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All Commercial Airlines Operating In Hawaii To Thoroughly Clean And Disinfect Their Aircraft Between Flights To Prevent The Spread Of Illnesses And Diseases, Including Covid-19.
Title
Urging All Commercial Airlines Operating In Hawaii To Thoroughly Clean And Disinfect Their Aircraft Between Flights To Prevent The Spread Of Illnesses And Diseases, Including Covid-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT/TRN, CPC, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR81 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT/TRN, CPC, referral sheet 39
HR64 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR64 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=64&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR64_.HTM |