HI HR81 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Full Voting Rights For Residents Of The District Of Columbia.
Title
United States Congress; Full Voting Rights for Residents of the District of Columbia
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Fale voting no (1) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1690) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR106 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Referred to PSM/JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=81&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR81_.HTM |