HI HR97 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu To Amend The Revised Ordinances Of Honolulu, As Proposed In A Bill By The Honolulu Youth Commission, That Creates A Safe Parking Pilot Program.
Title
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu To Amend The Revised Ordinances Of Honolulu, As Proposed In A Bill By The Honolulu Youth Commission, That Creates A Safe Parking Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR116 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=97&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR97_.HTM |