HI HR98 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR98
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Foster A More Supportive Regulatory Structure And Environment For Licensed Or Certified Care Facilities, Including Adult Residential Care Homes, Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes, And Community Care Foster Family Homes.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Foster A More Supportive Regulatory Structure And Environment For Licensed Or Certified Care Facilities, Including Adult Residential Care Homes, Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes, And Community Care Foster Family Homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR117 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, referral sheet 40
HR98 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR98 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=98&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR98_.HTM |