HI SB1025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Agriculture to plan, design, construct, operate, manage, maintain, repair, demolish, and remove infrastructure on any lands under the jurisdiction of the department, to support and promote agriculture. Establishes the agricultural enterprise program. Establishes the Agricultural Enterprise Special Fund. Requires the Board of Agriculture to annually report an accounting of non-agricultural park lessees to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Enterprises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1025 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
HB871 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 8:30AM in conference room CR 325.
HB871 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 8:30AM in conference room CR 325.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1025&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1025_.HTM |