HI SB1025 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Agriculture to plan, design, construct, operate, manage, maintain, repair, demolish, and remove infrastructure on any lands under the jurisdiction of the department, to support and promote agriculture. Establishes the agricultural enterprise program. Establishes the Agricultural Enterprise Special Fund. Requires the Board of Agriculture to annually report an accounting of non-agricultural park lessees to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Enterprises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2605) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB871 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 221, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
SB1025 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
SB1025 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.