HI SB1033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to provide funds for the Stadium Authority for payroll and other expenses. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Stadium Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to ECD/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-26 | House | Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha, Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1033 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB879 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).
HB879 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).