HI SB1034 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1034
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the existing health insurance mandate for coverage of low-dose mammography includes coverage for advancing methodologies of digital mammography and breast tomosynthesis. Sunsets June 30, 2024. (SB1034 HD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2183), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 345) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 537) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1034 (Carry Over) 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
HB481 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB481 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.