HI SB1041 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that an owner of range land owes no duty of care toward trespassers under specified conditions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Range Land; Liability of Owner; Trespass
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 232) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |