HI SB1042 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes housekeeping amendments to the law that establishes the State of Hawaii's popular name as the "Aloha State".
Title
Hawaii; Aloha State; Popular Name
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1042 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1042_.HTM |