HI SB1067 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1067
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Ocean-friendly Capitol Program to encourage offices within the State Capitol to commit to ocean-friendly practices. Appropriates funds for the installation of ocean-friendly measures in the State Capitol.
Title
Relating To The State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1067 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
HB847 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
HB847 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1067&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1067_.HTM |