HI SB1070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1070
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows first-time offenders convicted of misdemeanor operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant offenses in which no persons were injured to expunge the offense from their record if they maintain a clean criminal history record for ten years following the conviction.
Title
Relating To Convictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1070 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1070&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1070_.HTM |