HI SB1075 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 035, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 035, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 461J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, by mandating that physical therapists practicing in the State of Hawaii shall submit evidence of continuing competence at each renewal period.
Title
Physical Therapy; Continuing Competence
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Act 035, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135). |
2013-04-23 | House | Act 035, on 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-15 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 21). |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-14-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB844 (Same As) 2013-02-06 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Say excused (2).