HI SB1083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1083
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies benefits to alternate payees, advisory review determinations of Hawaii domestic relations orders and the priority of multiple orders. Applies to domestic relations orders submitted on or after its effective date. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Qualified Domestic Relations Orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB929 (Same As)
SB1083 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB1083 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.