HI SB1090 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs each state agency to establish cost-effective programs that encourage personnel to conserve electricity and water.
Title
Energy Resources; State Agencies; Conservation
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hooser, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to ENE, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |