HI SB1112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act 040, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Act 040, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to delete delinquent accounts receivable records for state low-income public housing projects that have been delinquent at least ninety days and also authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to assign delinquent accounts to a collection agency.
Title
Public Housing; Hawaii Public Housing Authority; State Public Housing; Delinquent Accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Act 040, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). |
2013-04-24 | House | Act 040, on 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 431). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 03-11-13 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 310). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-13 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB881 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5