HI SB1126 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the reimbursement rate for participants of the forest stewardship program. Clarifies that long-term leaseholders are eligible to participate in the program. Requires forest stewardship program applicants to enter into a program implementation agreement with BLNR, upon approval of the forest stewardship management plan by BLNR. Defines "program implementation agreement". Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Forest Stewardship Program
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-15 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-09-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room CR224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB957 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).