HI SB1152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a landlord low-income tenant tax credit.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 2:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS/HOU, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1225 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1152 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
SB1152 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1152&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1152_.HTM |