HI SB1156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1156
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the sunset date of Act 39, Session Laws of Hawaii 2015, thereby making permanent the requirements for a public accommodation that owns, leases, leases to, or operates a motion picture theater in more than two locations in the State to provide open movie captioning during at least two showings per week of each motion picture that is produced and offered with open movie captioning and audio descriptions upon request for all motion pictures for which such accommodations are available and provide public notice if such accommodations are not available for certain movies.
Title
Relating To Movie Theaters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 68). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-21-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1156 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1156&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1156_.HTM |