HI SB1163 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 204, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 204, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for civilian auxiliary aviation services of the type performed by the civil air patrol. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Civil Air Patrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 204, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 204, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1307). |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Deferred one day 05-04-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 161) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 161). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ichiyama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Keith-Agaran, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 2:02PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 2:01PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Chun Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Souza. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Elefante. |
2023-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 612). |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Lowen excused (3). |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-15 | House | The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2023-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 375) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB903 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation
Civil Air Patrol
Civilian Auxiliary Aviation Services
Department of Defense
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Civil Air Patrol
Civilian Auxiliary Aviation Services
Department of Defense
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency