HI SB1175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates chapter 329, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to make it consistent with amendments in federal law on controlled substances; amends section 329-14 to add new controlled substances emergency scheduled by the State under section 329-11; and amends section 329-75(h) to limit the penalty to violations of section 329-75(g) relating to pseudoephedrine.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 331). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 226) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB944 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Act 048, 4/23/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1148).