HI SB1195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2020.
Title
Relating To Conformity To The Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1195 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
HB1041 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 089, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
HB1041 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 089, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Subjects
Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2020
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1195&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1195_.HTM |