HI SB1238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 089, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Executive Office on Aging Administrative Claiming Special Fund to enhance the drawdown of federal funds. Appropriates funds. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Establishing The Executive Office On Aging Administrative Claiming Special Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 089, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
2019-06-12HouseAct 089, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 113).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-19 5:50PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 959).
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 700).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-19.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1987) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1615), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-20-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 26
2019-02-12HousePass First Reading
2019-02-11HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 6) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-02-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-08Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-11-19.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-08SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1012 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback