HI SB1254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to increase the on-call availability of emergency medical services and ambulance services in Ewa Beach. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB1254 HD1)
Title
Emergency Medical Care; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 704). |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Espero, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB362 (Same As) 2013-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Takumi, Tokioka excused (4).