HI SB1256 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties with a private activity bond issuance program to exhaust their allotment before applying to the State for the state allocation. Requires a project to first apply to the county in which the project is located, if the county has a private activity bond issuance program, before applying to the State. Requires the State, if it receives a county allocation, to award that same amount to benefit that county. Requires the department of budget and finance to indicate to the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation any county amount of unused or unassigned allocation. Effective 7/2/2023.
Title
Relating To Bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1256&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1256_.HTM |