HI SB1276 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 254, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 254, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires legislative authorization for the establishment of a basic health program, pursuant to the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Requires the insurance division of the department of commerce and consumer affairs to undertake a feasibility study of establishing a basic health program in Hawaii and to report its findings. (CD1)
Title
Insurance; Basic Health Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 254, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 254, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 16-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 16-12). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, M. Lee, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Chun Oakland, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 762). | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Chun Oakland, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Mizuno, M. Lee Co-Chairs; Jordan, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to CPC, HUS, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1686-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: C. Lee. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Saiki, Wooley excused (4). | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Herkes, Carroll, Morita, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-14-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 290) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Same As)