HI SB1302 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for disaster relief, recovery, mitigation, and remediation activities for the county of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Natural Disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Harimoto. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:45PM in conference room CR 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1180 (Same As)
SB1302 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB1302 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.